Accounts and annual returns MINISTRY OF SIGNS AND WONDERS
Charity number: 1158276
Charity reporting is overdue by 700 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 335 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 335 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 700 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 700 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 April 2022 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 April 2022 | 323 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 07 April 2021 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 07 April 2021 | 677 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 07 April 2021 | 677 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window