Financial history SHREWSBURY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1158418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £690 £3.62k £22.77k £2.02k £325
Total expenditure £929 £772 £22.12k £1.24k £828
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A