ADULLAM MISSIONS EVANGELISTIC NETWORK/HOUSE OF TESTIMONY

Charity number: 1158734
Charity reporting is overdue by 1580 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 850 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 850 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1215 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1215 days
Annual return 31 July 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1580 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1580 days