Accounts and annual returns MISSIONASSIST

Charity number: 1162807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 18 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 18 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 22 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 31 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 28 October 2019 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 28 October 2019 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window