Trustees GREEK SCHOOL OF ST. NICHOLAS LIVERPOOL
Charity number: 1166496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PANOS MAROPAKIS | Chair | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Father STAVROS NEOFITOU KASINOS | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elpiniki Smith | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Kousteni | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Katsara | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Olga Bakatsi-Cooke | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
THEOULLA HARALAMBOUS | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.