Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, COLCHESTER
Charity number: 1159205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Hannah Rosemary Cooper | Chair | 23 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Anne Mayne | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Huttley | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ordelia Sansford | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JULIA THOMAS | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lisselle Clarke-Moisley | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Duthie | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Adcock | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Jones | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Greenley | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anne La Thangue Mason | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smith | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Angier | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Mann | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Christopher Smith | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Harris | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Gettings | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
HUGH LESLIE THOMAS | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIANA BENGE-ABBOTT | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.