BILAL ACADEMY

Charity number: 1159456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £267.71k £43.93k £16.32k £29.62k £28.13k
Total expenditure £269.40k £30.77k £28.43k £26.83k £29.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A