TRANSPORT BENEVOLENT FUND (CIO)

Charity number: 1160901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.64m £3.52m £3.89m £4.17m £4.43m
Total expenditure £1.57m £3.62m £3.99m £4.39m £4.69m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.60m £3.44m £3.79m £4.06m £4.32m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36.00k £85.00k £97.00k £105.00k £117.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.18m £2.83m £3.12m £3.46m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £383.00k £778.00k £873.00k £931.00k £999.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £11.00k £11.00k £26.00k £24.00k £24.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0