ANIMAL CANOPY

Charity number: 1159870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.36k £14.42k £16.04k £22.13k £39.97k
Total expenditure £10.89k £11.95k £15.22k £25.19k £35.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A