Financial history THE ISOKON GALLERY TRUST

Charity number: 1161069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £14.05k £20.42k £31.23k £42.82k £20.27k
Total expenditure £15.57k £14.80k £21.83k £19.58k £24.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £15.61k £1.29k