Trustees DACHSHUND RESCUE CIO
Charity number: 1159602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Margaret Hall | Chair | 18 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Van Vuren | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kray | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Paxton | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Saywell | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Russell | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Elizabeth Salisbury | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.