Financial history DONCASTER CONVERSATION CLUB

Charity number: 1159775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.84k £10.50k £22.23k £16.63k £14.85k
Total expenditure £11.70k £15.99k £23.19k £14.41k £9.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £835 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.29k £4.57k £1.47k