Trustees ZJEDNOCZENIE POLSKIE W WIELKIEJ BRYTANII C.I.O.
Charity number: 1161316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alicja Donimirska | Chair | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karolina Ksiazek | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Suchcitz | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marta Tatol | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mariola Swietlicka | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Maria FINDLATER | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ARTUR BILDZIUK | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr WLODZIMIERZ MIER-JEDRZEJOWICZ PHD | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
TOMASZ MACHURA | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elzbieta KARDYNAL | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Monika Tkaczyk | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
TADEUSZ STENZEL | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.