Trustees CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF ERGONOMICS AND HUMAN FACTORS
Charity number: 1161870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen James Franklin | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Elizabeth Broadbent | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Thody | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sujan | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reji Baby | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Louise Ridsdale | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ibrahima Ba | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Carey | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Huw Gibson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elizabeth Sutton | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Richard Harmer | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Avery | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Monica Sen Gupta | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry Lansdown | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Byron Edwards | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Widdowson | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Peter Kirby | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Bridger | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK YOUNG | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.