Trustees SUTTON ON THE HILL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 505460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Thomas | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Geoffrey Lee | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Harrison | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Andrew Frost | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Finch | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Ann Tiano | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HOSKING | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALYSON LEE | Trustee | 24 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE JANE SEYMOUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joan Lennard | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.