OXFORDSHIRE PLAY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1160320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £135.47k £112.12k £96.70k £139.89k £130.24k
Total expenditure £170.09k £154.66k £148.15k £139.04k £121.86k
Income from government contracts £75.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £19.80k £10.00k £79.74k £50.00k