COMMUNITY LEISURE SERVICES PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1160374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.34m £1.66m £1.99m £2.69m £2.76m
Total expenditure £1.39m £1.65m £1.99m £2.67m £2.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £23.55k £32.71k £33.40k £35.44k £31.52k
Income - Charitable activities £1.32m £1.62m £1.96m £2.66m £2.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.34m £1.59m £1.91m £2.55m £2.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £51.81k £63.43k £82.96k £85.05k £68.75k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £28.63k £14.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £28.63k £0