CENTRAL CHESHIRE BUDDY SCHEME

Charity number: 1160519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £160.37k £174.55k £134.54k £167.13k £193.24k
Total expenditure £143.58k £132.97k £157.35k £146.91k £169.49k
Income from government contracts £99.00k £0 £21.00k £27.72k £21.00k
Income from government grants £13.00k £67.00k N/A N/A £14.00k