NUNEATON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1159747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.14k £13.21k £14.48k £18.86k £110.17k
Total expenditure £9.83k £13.27k £14.76k £9.83k £23.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.30k