Financial history THEATRE ROYAL HAYMARKET MASTERCLASS TRUST

Charity number: 1159840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £192.66k £253.06k £154.26k £262.73k £141.06k
Total expenditure £192.59k £263.87k £179.74k £173.73k £148.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £7.08k