CATS IN NEED MENORCA

Charity number: 1161878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £21.90k £24.11k £33.57k £33.92k £67.76k
Total expenditure £15.73k £22.06k £37.52k £32.52k £56.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A