Financial history THE ABINGDON BRIDGE

Charity number: 1160080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £124.30k £134.74k £183.83k £246.89k £372.44k
Total expenditure £101.12k £142.92k £172.72k £223.22k £321.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.30k £17.83k £20.94k £40.09k £53.08k