ST EDMUND'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1160454
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £22.70k £32.90k £31.74k £34.24k £32.71k
Total expenditure £22.22k £28.44k £33.39k £33.25k £34.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A