Financial history FASHION FOR RELIEF

Charity number: 1159995
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £0 £610.70k £1.72m £1.89m £22.11k
Total expenditure £0 £363.95k £1.80m £1.89m £99.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £610.70k £11.96k £82.98k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £1.71m £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £1.81m N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 £131 £303 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £180.89k £5.52k £205.10k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £183.06k £1.61m £1.68m N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £145.03k £0 £4.50k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £5.52k £200.60k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £183.49k £0 N/A