Financial history EDUCATION SUPPORT PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1161436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.88m £2.85m £2.71m £3.04m £3.51m
Total expenditure £3.78m £3.83m £2.98m £2.86m £3.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £301.86k £584.76k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57m £1.52m £1.42m £1.62m £1.72m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.10m £1.15m £916.96k £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £172.77k £182.98k £111.76k £85.42k £93.44k
Income - Other £75.00k £50.05k £31.00k £413.33k £666.81k
Income - Legacies £183.00k £187.28k £38.65k £218.75k £497.44k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.61m £2.01m £1.72m £1.80m £2.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds £679.31k £1.43m £1.12m £1.04m £1.07m
Expenditure - Governance £42.82k £107.76k £61.46k £58.05k £56.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £36.48k £43.51k £32.61k £25.68k £35.77k
Expenditure - Other £494.22k £386.91k £138.73k £14.38k £137.88k