Financial history ST MARY'S CHURCH AUGMENTATION OF LIVING FUND

Charity number: 505569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £7.41k £7.82k £8.31k £8.67k £6.70k
Total expenditure £2.63k £7.88k £4.63k £4.67k £4.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A