Financial history CHRIST CHURCH WALKLEY

Charity number: 1161307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £81.42k £214.23k £110.84k £151.36k £223.16k
Total expenditure £53.38k £84.27k £99.97k £120.90k £216.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £624 £1.16k