THE STEPHEN AND LAURA VAKIL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.04k £3.80k £3.37k £3.86k £2.34k
Total expenditure £780 £0 £800 £1.84k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A