Trustees SUTTON COLDFIELD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1160050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzann Ferguson | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carel Hextell | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mawbrey | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Baugh | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Johnson | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue James | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Cole | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Dawson | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Cook | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SMITH | Trustee | 01 June 1997 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.