Governing document WINDERMERE AND BOWNESS CIVIC SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/04/1973 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/1977 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/1998 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 09/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY WAS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN BOWNESS AND WINDERMERE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) A) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF WINDERMERE AS AT 31 MARCH 1974
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.