Financial history Reading National Spiritualist Centre

Charity number: 1159970
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £42.28k £45.08k £39.51k £41.07k £20.95k
Total expenditure £40.28k £42.82k £32.79k £38.24k £28.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A