Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW BY THE WARDROBE, LONDON

Charity number: 1162335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £80.95k £115.22k £245.74k £161.99k £610.90k
Total expenditure £109.16k £82.66k £141.15k £126.63k £330.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.03k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £109.24k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.34k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £477.29k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £122.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.40k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £600
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £206.20k