Accounts and annual returns SERVE UNITED
Charity number: 1163826
Charity reporting is overdue by 852 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 121 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 121 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 487 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 487 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 852 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 852 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 28 October 2020 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 28 October 2020 | 211 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window