Trustees HELPERBY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1162379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Mitchell | Chair | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
George Poole | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aubrey Lee Ambrose | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shepherdson | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Steven King | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Frances Shepherdson | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Graham Costello | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martine Barbara Laux | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Laux | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.