ANATOLIAN CULTURES AND CIVILIZATION AID SOLIDARITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1163198
Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 305 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 305 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1036 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1036 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1401 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1401 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1766 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1766 days