Financial history THE SENORA TRUST

Charity number: 1163053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.90k £5.41k £8.55k £50 £8.38k
Total expenditure £3.38k £3.67k £2.03k £5.18k £8.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A