Accounts and annual returns 4 STEPS TO A SMILE
Charity number: 1162729
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 111 days late | |
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 22 June 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | 22 June 2022 | 82 days late | |
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 04 April 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 June 2020
(These accounts |
11 August 2021 | 132 days late | |
Annual return | 01 June 2019 | 26 June 2020 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2019 | 29 June 2020 | 89 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window