Financial history INCLUSION HAMPSHIRE

Charity number: 1162711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £319.65k £324.98k £427.76k £471.74k £614.02k
Total expenditure £311.23k £320.18k £318.23k £334.03k £460.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A £42.64k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.50k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £534.82k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £484
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.22k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £460.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0