Financial history THE HM TOWER OF LONDON CHAPELS ROYAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £225.72k £250.49k £247.63k £158.00k £471.30k
Total expenditure £205.23k £189.23k £165.52k £106.95k £207.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A