Financial history MISS ISLE SCHOOL OF SIP & PUFF SAILING

Charity number: 1162550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/07/2018 06/07/2019 06/07/2020 06/07/2021 06/07/2022
Total gross income £2.57k £11.09k £3.91k £3.61k £5.10k
Total expenditure £1.22k £1.92k £12.57k £1.64k £2.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A