Accounts and annual returns BETTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION WEST AFRICA

Charity number: 1169646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 October 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 October 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 October 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 October 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 October 2018 23 October 2019 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 October 2018 23 October 2019 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 30 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window