THE DEARNE PLAYHOUSE

Charity number: 1163202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £112.48k £122.67k £109.35k £127.36k
Total expenditure £0 £99.36k £119.86k £110.81k £100.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £412 £11.44k N/A £25.00k