BENGALI CULTURAL SOCIETY, READING

Charity number: 1161671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.12k £26.37k £41.26k £29.13k £36.04k
Total expenditure £18.61k £21.57k £46.22k £23.60k £27.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A