Financial history LACE CITY CHORUS

Charity number: 1162618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £56.19k £51.58k £30.52k £14.86k £14.86k
Total expenditure £40.49k £65.11k £23.68k £12.97k £12.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A