Financial history TRINITY CHURCH LANCASTER

Charity number: 1161702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £49.64k £24.49k £23.38k £23.94k £33.22k
Total expenditure £35.16k £42.15k £21.37k £6.45k £8.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A