ST. ANDREW'S METHODIST CHURCH, BUSHEY HEATH

Charity number: 1163054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £84.83k £59.49k £40.10k £42.45k £40.93k
Total expenditure £99.99k £35.78k £40.94k £39.47k £64.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £500 N/A