Financial history ENDANGERED SPECIES PROTECTION AGENCY

Charity number: 1164052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £744.41k £964.83k £2.32m £2.21m £1.23m
Total expenditure £859.79k £1.00m £2.16m £2.14m £1.43m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £151.26k
Income - Other trading activities £17.29k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £727.12k £962.70k £2.30m £2.21m £1.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £2.13k £12.63k £1.87k £69
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £733.57k £1.00m £2.16m £2.14m £1.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.29k £0 £0 £0 £91.12k
Expenditure - Governance £7.08k £0 £0 £9.98k £10.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £108.93k £0 £0 £0 £0