Accounts and annual returns SQUARE ROOTS PRODUCTIONS CIO

Charity number: 1163954
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 81 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 81 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 08 February 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 07 March 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 07 March 2022 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 29 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window