Trustees HOME-START LONDON
Charity number: 1161629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIA ROBERTS | Chair | 20 April 2015 |
|
|||||
IAN JESNICK | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Fran Boto | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Silva Hrabar | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Messenger | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA SMYTH | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Margaret O'Conner | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ally Cross | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Lezama | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Helen Anastasi | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Karen Robertson | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.