LEVENSHULME INSPIRE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £200.46k £6.77k £22.11k £108.62k
Total expenditure £0 £43.18k £65.23k £62.11k £128.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £5.00k